As on : September 23,2024
Director Identification Number (DIN) : 0000033314
Sr No. | Company Name | CIN / LLPIN / FCRN | Date Of Appointment | Date Of Incorporation | PaidUp Capital / Contribution | Serving As Director Since |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1 | ADLN SUPERSTRUCTURE LLP | ABC-3753 | 01-04-2023 | 12-09-2022 | ₹20,00,000 | |
2 | ASL INDUSTRIES LIMITED | L36900WB1992PLC099901 | 24-04-2000 | 20-02-1992 | ₹10,41,70,900 | |
3 | ASL MOTORS PRIVATE LIMITED | U34103WB1999PTC099900 | 20-12-1999 | 02-04-1999 | ₹1,39,80,610 | |
4 | ASL MOTORS PRIVATE LIMITED | U34103WB1999PTC099900 | 20-12-1999 | 30-06-2021 | ₹1,00,000 | |
5 | ASLE ROLLING MILLS PRIVATE LIMITED | U29301WB2023PTC260399 | 15-03-2023 | 15-03-2023 | ₹1,00,000 | |
6 | COMET DISTRIBUTORS LLP | AAH-1593 | 17-08-2016 | 17-08-2016 | ₹1,70,000 | |
7 | COMET DISTRIBUTORS PVT LTD | U51909WB1996PTC076654 | 09-12-1996 | 16-01-1996 | ₹1,70,000 | |
8 | STARK SUPERSTRUCTURE LLP | AAJ-0022 | 01-04-2020 | 29-03-2017 | ₹10,00,000 |
Sr No. | DIN | Director Name |
---|---|---|
1 | 00033314 | JAYSHREE GOYAL (8) |
2 | 00033590 | DILIP KUMAR GOYAL (17) |
3 | 00201393 | AKSHAY GOYAL (6) |
4 | 00277559 | ASHOK KUMAR GOYAL (3) |
5 | 00287772 | NAVIN AGARWAL (3) |
6 | 00434495 | MURARI LAL KHANDELWAL (3) |
7 | 00798881 | PAWAN KUMAR PODDAR (6) |
8 | 00963125 | ANKIT GOYAL (8) |
9 | 02105829 | NITIN BHALOTIA (9) |
10 | 06698824 | ANKIT PODDAR (10) |
11 | 07615970 | ASHISH LODHA (1) |
12 | 09033420 | RINKI BHALOTIA (6) |
13 | 10019219 | LALIT MOHAN AGARWAL (1) |
Do you really want to delete these records? This process cannot be undone.