As on : September 21,2024
Director Identification Number (DIN) : 0000228105
Sr No. | Company Name | CIN / LLPIN / FCRN | Date Of Appointment | Date Of Incorporation | PaidUp Capital / Contribution | Serving As Director Since |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1 | DHOOT BRINDAVAN RESORTS PRIVATE LIMITED | U55101WB2023PTC261462 | 25-04-2023 | 25-04-2023 | ₹1,00,000 | |
2 | KRISHAGYAN VENTURES LLP | AAW-9267 | 04-05-2021 | 04-05-2021 | ₹1,00,00,000 | |
3 | NEELRUP ESTATES PRIVATE LIMITED | U70109DL2019PTC357483 | 07-02-2022 | 15-11-2019 | ₹1,00,000 | |
4 | SAI GURU MAHARASHTRA AGRO FOOD INDUSTRIES PRIVATE LIMITED | U15122MH2015PTC265879 | 30-09-2018 | 22-06-2015 | ₹1,00,000 | |
5 | UV STRATEGIC ADVISERS PRIVATE LIMITED | U74999DL2017PTC315556 | 30-09-2021 | 05-04-2017 | ₹1,00,000 |
Sr No. | DIN | Director Name |
---|---|---|
1 | 00013573 | PRAMOD SHARMA (1) |
2 | 00175814 | VED PRAKASH BHARDWAJ (2) |
3 | 00228105 | HIMANSHU GUPTA (5) |
4 | 00760633 | GANESH CHAND GUPTA (5) |
5 | 00760662 | BRIJESH GUPTA (7) |
6 | 01207930 | PIYUSH DHOOT (3) |
7 | 02104727 | DEENA NATH PATHAK (2) |
8 | 08611532 | RUPIKA GUPTA (1) |
9 | 09069934 | PRAKASH CHANDRA SHARMA (1) |
Do you really want to delete these records? This process cannot be undone.