As on : September 22,2024
Director Identification Number (DIN) : 0000173929
Sr No. | Company Name | CIN / LLPIN / FCRN | Date Of Appointment | Date Of Incorporation | PaidUp Capital / Contribution | Serving As Director Since |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1 | ASHOK AUTO FINANCE AND LEASING LIMITED | U45202UP1994PLC016138 | 22-02-1994 | 22-02-1994 | ₹1,30,00,700 | |
2 | HICKS THERMAMETERS INDIA LIMITED | U33112UP1961PLC002846 | 01-12-2014 | 06-02-1961 | ₹32,55,000 | |
3 | M V COTSPIN LIMITED | L18101WB1993PLC060752 | 22-08-2022 | 17-11-1993 | ₹4,71,55,000 |
Sr No. | DIN | Director Name |
---|---|---|
1 | 00173929 | HARI PRAKASH GUPTA (3) |
2 | 00174038 | SIDDHARTH GUPTA (2) |
3 | 00174200 | KUSUM GUPTA (2) |
4 | 00200242 | SMITA AGARWAL (6) |
5 | 00387048 | BHARAT BANSAL (9) |
6 | 00389984 | SUMIT UTHRA (4) |
7 | 00595954 | VIVEK AGARWALA (9) |
8 | 00939677 | SHER SINGH (1) |
9 | 01219851 | VINAY DALMIA (2) |
10 | 01229390 | BHARAT BHUSHAN DEVA (2) |
11 | 01243291 | RANJANA BANSAL (9) |
12 | 01471937 | RAJAN KISHORE (2) |
13 | 08741334 | YATHARTH GUPTA (1) |
Do you really want to delete these records? This process cannot be undone.