As on : September 21,2024
Director Identification Number (DIN) : 0000087217
Sr No. | Company Name | CIN / LLPIN / FCRN | Date Of Appointment | Date Of Incorporation | PaidUp Capital / Contribution | Serving As Director Since |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1 | PL ADVISORY SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED | U67120MH2005PTC155815 | 06-09-2005 | 09-01-2005 | ₹5,00,000 | |
2 | PL COMMODITY MARKETS PRIVATE LIMITED | U51100MH2005PTC157590 | 15-11-2022 | 25-11-2005 | ₹1,13,00,000 | |
3 | PL DISTRIBUTION COMPANY PRIVATE LIMITED | U74140MH2008PTC186000 | 15-11-2022 | 20-08-2008 | ₹10,00,000 | |
4 | PL INSURANCE BROKING SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED | U66010MH2008PTC184265 | 15-11-2022 | 07-03-2008 | ₹60,00,000 | |
5 | SAMYA CONSULTING PRIVATE LIMITED | U74900MH2010PTC199721 | 04-02-2010 | 02-04-2010 | ₹1,00,000 | |
6 | SHETH FINANCIAL SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED | U74140MH1992PTC065256 | 06-02-1992 | 02-06-1992 | ₹1,00,000 |
Sr No. | DIN | Director Name |
---|---|---|
1 | 00031938 | SANDIP SURESH RAICHURA (4) |
2 | 00033108 | RATAN NOSHIR KARANJIA (4) |
3 | 00079530 | MIHIR ARUN SHETH (2) |
4 | 00086891 | ARUN PRABHUDAS SHETH (3) |
5 | 00087217 | DHIREN PRABHUDAS SHETH (6) |
6 | 00089193 | AMISHA NIRAJ VORA (9) |
7 | 00089257 | DILIP PARMESHWAR BHAT (3) |
8 | 07014997 | PURNIMA ARUN SHETH (2) |
9 | 07015041 | LINA DHIREN SHETH (1) |
10 | 09491989 | SHAILI SIDDHARTH VORA (3) |
11 | 09797293 | RUPESH JAGDISH AGRAWAL (2) |
Do you really want to delete these records? This process cannot be undone.