As on : September 21,2024
Director Identification Number (DIN) : 0000025543
Sr No. | Company Name | CIN / LLPIN / FCRN | Date Of Appointment | Date Of Incorporation | PaidUp Capital / Contribution | Serving As Director Since |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1 | KARMA ENERGY LIMITED | L31101MH2007PLC168823 | 09-02-2017 | 17-11-1972 | ₹23,84,55,000 | |
2 | KARMA ENERGY LIMITED | L31101MH2007PLC168823 | 09-02-2017 | 15-03-2007 | ₹11,56,99,180 | |
3 | PRABHANJAN MULTITRADE PRIVATE LIMITED | U51909MH2002PTC138384 | 01-04-2005 | 24-12-2002 | ₹1,00,000 | |
4 | SAMARTH MULTITRADE PRIVATE LIMITED | U51909MH2006PTC166595 | 17-05-2014 | 29-12-2006 | ₹1,00,000 | |
5 | SANCHAY PROPERTIES PRIVATE LIMITED | U45201MH2006PTC166310 | 17-05-2014 | 19-12-2006 | ₹1,00,000 | |
6 | SARVODAYA PROPERTIES PRIVATE LIMITED | U45400MH2007PTC169625 | 17-05-2014 | 04-03-2007 | ₹1,00,000 | |
7 | VISION INTERNATIONAL IMPEX (INDIA) PRIVATE LIMITED | U74120MH2013FTC246341 | 27-05-2014 | 29-07-2013 | ₹1,00,000 | |
8 | WEIZMANN LIMITED | L65990MH1985PLC038164 | 25-10-1993 | 25-11-1985 | ₹17,27,15,360 |
Sr No. | DIN | Director Name |
---|---|---|
1 | 00021986 | NEELKAMAL VRAJLAL SIRAJ (6) |
2 | 00022021 | CHETAN DURGADAS MEHRA (14) |
3 | 00022021 | CHETAN MEHRA (14) |
4 | 00025543 | DHARMENDRA GULABCHAND SIRAJ (8) |
5 | 00033887 | ANJU DHARMENDRA SIRAJ (1) |
6 | 00033887 | ANJU SIRAJ (1) |
7 | 00050218 | SMITA VINESH DAVDA (3) |
8 | 00058048 | HITESH VRAJLAL SIRAJ (4) |
9 | 00444408 | KISHORE MADHAVSINH VUSSONJI (4) |
10 | 01262317 | BALADY SHEKAR SHETTY (3) |
Do you really want to delete these records? This process cannot be undone.