As on : September 22,2024
Director Identification Number (DIN) : 0000209638
Sr No. | Company Name | CIN / LLPIN / FCRN | Date Of Appointment | Date Of Incorporation | PaidUp Capital / Contribution | Serving As Director Since |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1 | BVK HEALTHCARE LLP | AAA-9167 | 10-05-2012 | 10-05-2012 | ₹2,00,000 | |
2 | GOPALDAS VISRAM AND COMPANY LIMITED | U52100MH2005PLC156917 | 30-03-2015 | 20-10-2005 | ₹10,00,00,000 | |
3 | SARJAN INVESTMENT PRIVATE LIMITED | U67120MH2001PTC133842 | 02-11-2001 | 11-02-2001 | ₹2,00,000 | |
4 | VERTIS MICROSYSTEMS LLP | AAA-3210 | 01-11-2015 | 27-12-2010 | ₹ |
Sr No. | DIN | Director Name |
---|---|---|
1 | 00036661 | CHANDRESH VALLABHDAS THAKKER (3) |
2 | 00051296 | DINESH VALLABHDAS THAKKER (4) |
3 | 00051328 | MUKUND VALLABHDAS THAKKER (3) |
4 | 00209638 | CHINUBHAI SHANTILAL SHAH (4) |
5 | 00437042 | MUKESH CHANDRAKANT KHAGRAM (2) |
6 | 01874980 | PINKI SUNIL SHAH (1) |
7 | 01878355 | SUNIL MAHENDRA SHAH (1) |
8 | 02380546 | KAMLESH MAHENDRA SHAH (1) |
9 | 02949536 | JAY MUKUND THAKKER (1) |
10 | 03099468 | JITEN JAYANTILAL SHAH (3) |
11 | 05217324 | BALARAM JIVRAJ DHOTRE (1) |
12 | 05217336 | DIPTI VINOD DHOTRE (1) |
13 | 05231761 | VINODKUMAR BALARAM DHOTRE (1) |
14 | 06724952 | SHEELA CHINUBHAI SHAH (1) |
15 | 08209669 | KANAV CHANDRESH THAKKER (2) |
Do you really want to delete these records? This process cannot be undone.