As on : September 21,2024
Director Identification Number (DIN) : 0000578247
Sr No. | Company Name | CIN / LLPIN / FCRN | Date Of Appointment | Date Of Incorporation | PaidUp Capital / Contribution | Serving As Director Since |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1 | ARAIYA SPIRITUAL AND SOCIAL FOUNDATION | U92419MH2023NPL397930 | 19-01-2023 | 19-01-2023 | ₹10,00,000 | |
2 | NEELVASU HOLIDAY RESORTS LLP | AAB-3931 | 12-03-2013 | 12-03-2013 | ₹1,00,000 | |
3 | PREMCHAND REALTORS PRIVATE LIMITED | U70109MH2007PTC167319 | 30-09-2014 | 27-01-2007 | ₹1,00,000 | |
4 | SHANTI RESORTS LLP | AAB-3932 | 12-03-2013 | 12-03-2013 | ₹1,00,000 | |
5 | SHANTI RESORTS PRIVATE LIMITED | U55101MH1989PTC054182 | 07-11-1989 | 11-07-1989 | ₹1,00,000 |
Do you really want to delete these records? This process cannot be undone.