As on : September 21,2024
Director Identification Number (DIN) : 0007925160
Sr No. | Company Name | CIN / LLPIN / FCRN | Date Of Appointment | Date Of Incorporation | PaidUp Capital / Contribution | Serving As Director Since |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1 | NADHAL LANDS LLP | AAG-4784 | 02-10-2020 | 27-05-2016 | ₹1,04,00,000 | |
2 | SHRI MANGRAYA SUGAR AND POWER PRIVATE LIMITED | U15490PN2017PTC171820 | 31-08-2017 | 03-08-2017 | ₹1,00,000 |
Sr No. | DIN | Director Name |
---|---|---|
1 | 01787972 | RAJESH SURENDRA RAVAL (3) |
2 | 01788037 | SANJAY SURENDRAKUMAR RAVAL (7) |
3 | 01788094 | JITENDRA SURENDRAKUMAR RAVAL (3) |
4 | 07161054 | UDAY RAMCHANDRA DANGE (1) |
5 | 07161062 | MANISHA UDAY DANGE (2) |
6 | 07881174 | RAMCHANDRA BHAU DANGE (1) |
7 | 07924345 | KIRAN RAMCHANDRA DANGE (1) |
8 | 07924366 | SHUBHAM ANNASO JONG (1) |
9 | 07925160 | BHAVNA RAJESH RAVAL (2) |
10 | 09228087 | ASHISH SHASHIKANT RAVAL (1) |
Do you really want to delete these records? This process cannot be undone.