As on : September 21,2024
Director Identification Number (DIN) : 0001587901
Sr No. | Company Name | CIN / LLPIN / FCRN | Date Of Appointment | Date Of Incorporation | PaidUp Capital / Contribution | Serving As Director Since |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1 | GOLDCREST CORPORATION LIMITED | U74999MH1983PLC029408 | 01-04-2015 | 25-02-1983 | ₹7,55,67,600 | |
2 | GOLDCREST SOLUTIONS LLP | ACB-5251 | 07-06-2023 | 07-06-2023 | ₹3,00,00,000 | |
3 | PERIQUE PROPERTIES LLP | ACB-5225 | 07-06-2023 | 07-06-2023 | ₹1,00,000 | |
4 | PLUTO AGRO PRIVATE LIMITED | U01403MH2008PTC185725 | 12-08-2008 | 08-12-2008 | ₹1,00,000 | |
5 | REVIVE LABS LLP | AAD-0249 | 20-11-2015 | 08-12-2014 | ₹14,93,000 | |
6 | URANUS AGRO PRIVATE LIMITED | U01403MH2008PTC185786 | 13-08-2008 | 13-08-2008 | ₹1,00,000 | |
7 | VOYAGER AGRO PRIVATE LIMITED | U01403MH2008PTC185787 | 13-08-2008 | 13-08-2008 | ₹1,00,000 |
Sr No. | DIN | Director Name |
---|---|---|
1 | 00043146 | NIRAV SHIRISH MODY (8) |
2 | 00129255 | VISHAL ANIL MALHOTRA (4) |
3 | 00170591 | NITA TUSHAR TANNA (3) |
4 | 00170645 | HANSA TULSIDAS TANNA (1) |
5 | 00317853 | CHIRAG CHETAN SHAH (2) |
6 | 00397420 | RAHUL CHANDRASIGH MEHTA (9) |
7 | 00397420 | RAHUL CHANDRASINGH MEHTA (9) |
8 | 00760066 | CHETAN HIMATLAL SHAH (1) |
9 | 01587901 | ANUPA TANNA SHAH (7) |
10 | 01729623 | AMISHA DEVEN MEHTA (4) |
11 | 02753244 | NAMRATA TUSHAR TANNA (2) |
12 | 02909384 | GUNEET SINGH (3) |
Do you really want to delete these records? This process cannot be undone.