As on : September 21,2024
Director Identification Number (DIN) : 0003562861
Sr No. | Company Name | CIN / LLPIN / FCRN | Date Of Appointment | Date Of Incorporation | PaidUp Capital / Contribution | Serving As Director Since |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1 | MALHAR PROMOTERS AND LAND DEVELOPERS LLP | AAC-2649 | 17-06-2014 | 21-04-2014 | ₹50,000 | |
2 | SHRI HAREKRISHNA HOSPITALITY PRIVATE LIMITED | U55101PN2011PTC140974 | 05-10-2011 | 10-05-2011 | ₹1,00,000 |
Sr No. | DIN | Director Name |
---|---|---|
1 | 01923131 | VIJAY NAMDEO MOZE (4) |
2 | 03562861 | AMEY PRALHAD LANDE (2) |
3 | 03562869 | NAMITA BHARGAVA (1) |
4 | 03562876 | NEELAM JHA (1) |
5 | 03620405 | MANJEETKAUR JASBEERSINGH CHOHAN (1) |
6 | 06789701 | VIRAJ VISHWANATH LANDE (3) |
7 | 07063365 | ADWAIT SURESH MULAY (4) |
8 | 08088537 | NAVIN BABULAL SINGH (2) |
Do you really want to delete these records? This process cannot be undone.