As on : September 23,2024
Director Identification Number (DIN) : 0003138745
Sr No. | Company Name | CIN / LLPIN / FCRN | Date Of Appointment | Date Of Incorporation | PaidUp Capital / Contribution | Serving As Director Since |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1 | GRUHAM DREAMS LLP | AAX-6240 | 01-07-2021 | 01-07-2021 | ₹5,00,000 | |
2 | N G BUILDCON PRIVATE LIMITED | U45400UP2010PTC114875 | 23-09-2011 | 06-01-2010 | ₹1,00,000 | |
3 | ONELLA REALTY PRIVATE LIMITED | U70101UP2012PTC120244 | 10-08-2015 | 11-05-2012 | ₹1,00,000 | |
4 | SADASHIV REAL ESTATE PRIVATE LIMITED | U70100UP2011PTC117337 | 16-08-2012 | 13-09-2011 | ₹1,00,000 | |
5 | SEVENTH SKY DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED | U45201UP2009PTC037134 | 25-09-2012 | 04-08-2009 | ₹1,00,000 |
Sr No. | DIN | Director Name |
---|---|---|
1 | 00709739 | AMIT KUMAR AGARWAL (5) |
2 | 01346052 | AISHWARYA PANDEY (4) |
3 | 02403491 | ANSHUMAN GARG (1) |
4 | 03138745 | AKSHAY AGARWAL (5) |
5 | 03473871 | SUDHIR PANDEY (3) |
6 | 09223530 | CHARU LATA AGARWAL (1) |
7 | 09223531 | PRATHU AGARWAL (1) |
8 | 09314165 | TAHA MOHAMMAD ABRAR SIDDIQUI (2) |
9 | 09314170 | ALI SIDDIQUI (1) |
Do you really want to delete these records? This process cannot be undone.