As on : September 20,2024
Director Identification Number (DIN) : 0002702020
Sr No. | Company Name | CIN / LLPIN / FCRN | Date Of Appointment | Date Of Incorporation | PaidUp Capital / Contribution | Serving As Director Since |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1 | HARITA CONSULTANCY AND MANAGEMENT SERVIC | AAH-5374 | 14-08-2019 | 04-10-2016 | ₹5,000 | |
2 | HARITA INSURANCE BROKING LLP | AAH-5778 | 07-10-2016 | ₹5,000 | ||
3 | HARITA INSURANCE BROKING LLP | AAH-5778 | 08-05-2017 | 07-10-2016 | ₹5,000 | |
4 | HARITA RECEIVABLES AND COLLECTION SERVIC | AAL-7796 | 19-01-2018 | ₹20,000 | ||
5 | HARITA RECEIVABLES AND COLLECTION SERVIC | AAL-7796 | 14-08-2019 | 19-01-2018 | ₹20,000 | |
6 | LV TRUSTEE PRIVATE LIMITED | U74999TN2017PTC115420 | 10-03-2017 | 10-03-2017 | ₹50,000 | |
7 | PRO ELITE REALTY DEVELOPERS LLP | AAI-1019 | 26-12-2016 | ₹10,000 | ||
8 | PRO ELITE REALTY DEVELOPERS LLP | AAI-1019 | 26-09-2019 | 26-12-2016 | ₹10,000 | |
9 | SIVASAILAM CHAMRAJ EDUCATION FOUNDATION | U80900TZ2022NPL038086 | 09-08-2022 | 31-01-2022 | ₹5,00,000 | |
10 | SIVASAILAM CHAMRAJ EDUCATION FOUNDATION | U80900TZ2022NPL038086 | 11-08-2023 | 31-01-2022 | ₹5,00,000 | |
11 | TVS MOTOR COMPANY LIMITED | L35921TN1992PLC022845 | 10-09-2014 | 06-10-1992 | ₹47,50,87,114 |
Sr No. | DIN | Director Name |
---|---|---|
1 | 00036080 | CHITTRANJAN DUA (7) |
2 | 00037022 | MALLIKA SRINIVASAN (4) |
3 | 00051523 | VENU SRINIVASAN (18) |
4 | 00067107 | KUPPUSAMY IYENGAR GOPALADESIKAN (14) |
5 | 02599393 | KUNNATH NARAYANAN RADHAKRISHNAN (3) |
6 | 02702020 | VENU LAKSHMI (7) |
7 | 02993708 | BALASUBRAMANYAM SRIRAM (4) |
8 | 03291640 | GOPALAKRISHNAN VISWANATHAN (6) |
9 | 03318908 | RALF DIETER SPETH (2) |
10 | 03601690 | SUDARSHAN VENU (15) |
11 | 06467315 | HEMANT KRISHAN SINGH (1) |
12 | 07139051 | DEEPALI PANT JOSHI (3) |
13 | 08815683 | PARAKKAT SHOBHANA RAVI (2) |
14 | 09007992 | ARUNACHALAM RAJARAMAN (2) |
15 | 09117910 | KUOK MENG XIONG (2) |
Do you really want to delete these records? This process cannot be undone.